US SB1064 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appalachian Energy for National Security Act This bill directs the Department of Energy to conduct a study on the national security impacts of building ethane and other natural gas liquids petrochemical infrastructure in the vicinity of the Marcellus, Utica, and Rogersville shale plays located in the Appalachian region of the United States. The study must include an examination of the proposed infrastructure, including an identification of the potential benefits to national and economic security and the risks posed by foreign ownership and control of U.S. domestic petrochemical resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appalachian Energy for National Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 177.
2019-08-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment. With written report No. 116-75.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2019-07-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2019-04-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback