US SB1057 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act This bill requires the Department of the Interior to carry out the Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan which was submitted to Congress on March 19, 2019, by Arizona, California, Colorado, Nevada, New Mexico, Utah, and Wyoming. Interior must execute the plan without delay and operate applicable Colorado River System reservoirs accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-04-09HouseReceived in the House.
2019-04-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2291-2292; text: CR S2295)

Same As/Similar To

HB2030 (Related) 2019-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback