US SB1057 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Amendments Act of 2017 This bill amends the Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Act of 1998 to reauthorize for FY2019-FY2023 the national harmful algal bloom and hypoxia program and the action strategy of the Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia. (Hypoxia is a deficiency of oxygen.) (Sec. 3) The task force must include a representative from the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Sec. 4) Each required scientific assessment of harmful algal blooms in coastal waters must examine freshwater harmful algal blooms that originate in freshwater lakes or rivers and migrate to coastal waters. (Sec. 5) In administering the program, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) must provide: (1) grants for accelerating the utilization of effective methods of intervention and mitigation to reduce the frequency, severity, and impacts of harmful algal bloom and hypoxia events; and (2) technical assistance to regional state, tribal, and local governments with respect to harmful algal blooms and hypoxia events. NOAA must use cost effective methods in carrying out the Act and develop contingency plans for the long-term monitoring of hypoxia. (Sec. 7) Federal officials may determine whether a harmful algal bloom or hypoxia event is an event of national significance and give funding to the affected state or local government for assessing and mitigating the detrimental environmental, economic, subsistence use, and public health effects of an event of national significance.
Title
Harmful Algal Bloom and Hypoxia Research and Control Amendments Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-09-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S6146-6147) |
2017-09-26 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6146) |
2017-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.1105 Amendment SA 1105 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.1105 Amendment SA 1105 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S6146; text: CR S6146) To improve the bill. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6145-6147; text: CR S6145-6146) |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-145. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4417 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB6645 (Related) 2018-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB6645 (Related) 2018-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Army Corps of Engineers
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Army Corps of Engineers
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Government studies and investigations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality