US SB1040 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to expand eligibility for hospital care, medical services, and nursing home care from the Department of Veterans Affairs to include veterans of World War II.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to expand eligibility for hospital care, medical services, and nursing home care from the Department of Veterans Affairs to include veterans of World War II.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5562 (Same As) 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1040/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1040/BILLS-117s1040is.pdf |