US SB1037 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
First Responders Support Act of 2009 - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to: (1) increase death and disability benefits for public safety officers; and (2) expand educational benefits for dependents of public safety officers killed or disabled in the line of duty. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a tax credit for up to $7,500 of the medical expenses paid or incurred by a public safety officer or a family member for injuries sustained while such officer was performing an official duty. Authorizes the Director of the Bureau of Justice Assistance to award grants for mental health services or counseling to public safety officers seriously injured in the line of duty and the family members of such officers who are killed or seriously injured in the line of duty.
Title
First Responders Support Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Same As) 2009-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4338 (Related) 2010-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2885 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4338 (Related) 2010-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2885 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1037/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1037/BILLS-111s1037is.pdf |