US SB1029 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes federal courts to allow a certified facility dog to accompany a witness testifying in a criminal proceeding.
Title
Courthouse Dogs Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7233-7234) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1274 Amendment SA 1274 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1274 Amendment SA 1274 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7233; text: CR S7233) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7233-7234) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5403 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Evidence and witnesses
Judicial procedure and administration
Mammals
Service animals
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Evidence and witnesses
Judicial procedure and administration
Mammals
Service animals