US SB1028 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
RAISE Family Caregivers Act Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop and make publicly available a National Family Caregiving Strategy that identifies recommended actions for recognizing and supporting family caregivers in a manner that reflects their diverse needs. (Sec. 4) HHS shall convene a Family Caregiving Advisory Council to advise the department on recognizing and supporting family caregivers. (Sec. 6) The council shall terminate after five years.
Title
RAISE Family Caregivers Act Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-09-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.1102 Amendment SA 1102 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.1102 Amendment SA 1102 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S6140) To amend the title. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6139-6140) |
2017-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.1101 Amendment SA 1101 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | S.Amdt.1101 Amendment SA 1101 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S6139-6140; text: CR S6139-6140) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6143) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Special Committee on Aging. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-364. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 78. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2724) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3759 (Related) 2018-01-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-119. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aging
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Family services
Government information and archives
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Aging
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Family services
Government information and archives
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare