US SB1009 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 regarding the procurement of certain items related to national security interests for Department of Homeland Security frontline operational components, and for other purposes.
Title
HOPR Act Homeland Procurement Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 543. |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-192. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2915 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 578.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.