US HR996 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns Russia's attempts to harmfully influence domestic politics and stimulate unrest in the United States and allied countries. The resolution calls on the United States, as well as the European Union, to continue sanctions against Yevgeniy Prigozhin and his affiliated entities. (Prigozhin is a Russian businessman accused of interference in the 2016 U.S. presidential election and the 2018 U.S. midterm elections).
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that the activities of Russian national Yevgeniy Prigozhin and his affiliated entities pose a threat to the national interests and security of the United States and of its allies and partners.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6083-6084) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 996. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6083-6084) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2018 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4632-4633)
Subjects
Alliances
European Union
Foreign and international corporations
International affairs
Militias and paramilitary groups
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
European Union
Foreign and international corporations
International affairs
Militias and paramilitary groups
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities