US HR99 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of Career and Technical Education Month.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of Career and Technical Education Month.
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR91 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1032-1033)
HR923 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR515 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S711-712)
HR923 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR515 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: CR S711-712)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/99/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres99/BILLS-117hres99ih.pdf |