US HR977 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Gun Violence Awareness Month and the designation of National Gun Violence Awareness Day.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of June 5, 2020, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2020 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR217 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3011)
SR592 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2556)
HR391 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SR592 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2556)
HR391 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/977/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres977/BILLS-116hres977ih.pdf |