US HR972 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-26)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the seriousness of polycystic ovary syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of the month of September 2020 as "PCOS Awareness Month". This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of Polycystic Ovary Syndrome (PCOS) Awareness Month. PCOS is caused by a hormone imbalance. Symptoms can include infertility, weight gain, excess hair growth, and acne. It recognizes the need for further research, improved treatment and care options, and a cure for PCOS. It also acknowledges the struggles affecting all women and girls afflicted with PCOS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the seriousness of polycystic ovary syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of the month of September 2020 as "PCOS Awareness Month".

Sponsors

Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-05-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR146 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR317 (Related) 2019-09-18 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5580-5581)
SR670 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5285-5286)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback