US HR959 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-20)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States. This resolution thanks the teachers of the United States and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to recognize National Teacher Appreciation Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the roles and contributions of the teachers of the United States in building and enhancing the civic, cultural, and economic well-being of the United States.

Sponsors

Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2020-05-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR363 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR197 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2748-2749; text: CR S2748)
SR568 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2347; text: CR S2343)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback