US HR958 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns political imprisonments in Russia and calls on Russia to release its political prisoners. The resolution also urges the United States to advocate for the release of such prisoners and to identify the Russian officials responsible for their imprisonment.
Title
Condemning the practice of politically motivated imprisonment and calling for the immediate release of political prisoners in the Russian Federation and urging action by the United States Government to impose sanctions with respect to persons responsible for that form of human rights abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6084-6085) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 958. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6084-6086) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR524 (Related) 2020-03-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1258-1259)
Subjects
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Protest and dissent
Russia
Sanctions
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Protest and dissent
Russia
Sanctions