US HR950 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2020, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women and Girls".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of May 5, 2020, as the "National Day of Awareness for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women and Girls".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2020-05-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-05-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR606 (Related) 2020-06-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2700; text: CR S2699)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback