US HR95 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Cancer Prevention Day.
Title
Expressing support for designation of February 4, 2019, as National Cancer Prevention Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR831 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/95/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres95/BILLS-116hres95ih.pdf |