US HR944 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5143) to provide greater transparency and congressional oversight of international insurance standards setting processes, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from December 9, 2016, through January 3, 2017; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5143) to provide greater transparency and congressional oversight of international insurance standards setting processes, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from December 9, 2016, through January 3, 2017; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5143) to provide greater transparency and congressional oversight of international insurance standards setting processes, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from December 9, 2016, through January 3, 2017; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 231 N: 178 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 232 N: 180 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 232 N: 180 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 232 N: 180 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 232 N: 180 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 232 - 180 (Roll no. 610). (text: CR H7288) |
2016-12-07 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 178 (Roll no. 609). |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7299-7301) |
2016-12-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 944, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Hastings demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2016-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 944. |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7288-7292) |
2016-12-06 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 162. |
2016-12-06 | House | It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of December 8, 2016, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules as though under clause 1 of rule XV. |
2016-12-06 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-846, by Mr. Byrne. |