US HR941 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5366-5367)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5366-5367)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the importance of public park and recreation facilities and activities and expressing support for the designation of the month of July as "Park and Recreation Month". Recognizes the value of public park and recreation facilities and activities and their importance in communities across the United States. Supports the designation of a Park and Recreation Month.
Title
Recognizing the importance of public park and recreation facilities and activities and expressing support for the designation of the month of July as "Park and Recreation Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5366-5367) |
2018-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-06-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR406 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5299-5300)
SR569 (Related) 2018-07-09 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SR569 (Related) 2018-07-09 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Congressional tributes
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/941/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres941/BILLS-115hres941ih.pdf |