US HR926 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2020, as "Black Maternal Health Week" to bring national attention to the United States maternal health crisis in the Black community and the importance of reducing maternal mortality and morbidity among Black women and birthing persons. This resolution recognizes (1) the significance of Black Maternal Health Week; (2) that Black Maternal Health Week is an opportunity to raise national awareness of the state of black maternal health in the United States; and (3) that black women experience high, disproportionate rates of maternal mortality and morbidity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2020, as "Black Maternal Health Week" to bring national attention to the United States maternal health crisis in the Black community and the importance of reducing maternal mortality and morbidity among Black women and birthing persons.

Sponsors

Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-04-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR317 (Related) 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR154 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2390)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback