US HR918 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 3249) to authorize the Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 8) to provide for improvements to the rivers and harbors of the United States, to provide for the conservation and development of water and related resources, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 3249) to authorize the Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 8) to provide for improvements to the rivers and harbors of the United States, to provide for the conservation and development of water and related resources, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
Title
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 3249) to authorize the Project Safe Neighborhoods Grant Program, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 8) to provide for improvements to the rivers and harbors of the United States, to provide for the conservation and development of water and related resources, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 234 (Y: 224 N: 176 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 235 (Y: 223 N: 175 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 235 (Y: 223 N: 175 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-06 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 223 - 175 (Roll no. 235). (text: CR H4785) |
2018-06-06 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 224 - 176 (Roll no. 234). (consideration: CR H4791-4792) |
2018-06-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 918. |
2018-06-06 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4785-4792) |
2018-06-05 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 150. |
2018-06-05 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of the Senate amendment to H.R. 3249 in addition to providing for consideration of H.R. 8 and H.R. 5895. Each measure will be debatable for 1 hour. For H.R. 8, the resolution makes in order only those amendments printed in part A of the report. For H.R. 5895, the resolution makes in order only those amendments printed in part B of the report. |
2018-06-05 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-711, by Mr. Woodall. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
HB3249 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-185.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HR923 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3249 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-185.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HR923 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.