US HR892 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calling on the Government of the Republic of Rwanda to release Paul Rusesabagina on humanitarian grounds.
Title
Calling on the Government of the Republic of Rwanda to release Paul Rusesabagina on humanitarian grounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended (Y: 413 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 8 (Roll no. 355). (text: 06/21/2022 CR H5714-5715) |
2022-07-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6608-6609) |
2022-06-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 892. |
2022-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5714-5716) |
2022-06-21 | House | Ms. Manning moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2022-02-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |