US HR889 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools.
Title
Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2022-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR66 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR33 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S486-487)
SR506 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S577; text: CR S576-577)
SR33 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S486-487)
SR506 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S577; text: CR S576-577)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/889/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres889/BILLS-117hres889ih.pdf |