US HR868 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of May 27, 2018, through June 2, 2018, as "Great Lakes Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of May 27, 2018, through June 2, 2018, as "Great Lakes Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-05-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-05-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/868/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres868/BILLS-115hres868ih.pdf |