US HR864 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the goals and ideals of Career and Technical Education Month. This resolution supports the designation of Career and Technical Education Month to celebrate career and technical education across the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the goals and ideals of Career and Technical Education Month.

Sponsors

Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]
Rep. John Carter [R-TX]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR119 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR79 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1496; text: CR S1493)
SR515 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1230-1231)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback