US HR862 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 110-17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the designation of the week of February 24 through February 28, 2020, as "Public Schools Week". This resolution supports the designation of Public Schools Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of the week of February 24 through February 28, 2020, as "Public Schools Week".

Sponsors

Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2020-02-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR254 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR126 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
SR521 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1233-1234)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback