US HR860 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 1836) to amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that the time during which members of the Armed Forces serve on active duty for training qualifies for educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 4673) to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the automatic enrollment of eligible veterans in patient enrollment system of Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 1836) to amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that the time during which members of the Armed Forces serve on active duty for training qualifies for educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 4673) to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the automatic enrollment of eligible veterans in patient enrollment system of Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 219 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-01-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 203 (Roll no. 3). (text: CR H23) |
2022-01-11 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 203 (Roll no. 2). |
2022-01-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 860. |
2022-01-11 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H23-31) |
2022-01-10 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 61. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1836 and H.R. 4673. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2022-01-10 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-225, by Mr. Perlmutter. |
2022-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1836 (Related) 2022-01-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR860 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4673 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR860 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4673 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.