US HR858 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5-1)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates the Inter-American Foundation (IAF) on its 40th anniversary. Declares that the IAF is a vital component of U.S. foreign policy in the Americas and of the U.S. development agenda.
Title
Congratulating the Inter-American Foundation (IAF) on its 40th anniversary and recognizing its significant accomplishments and contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Delahunt [D-MA] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Rep. Gabrielle Giffords [D-AZ] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Kendrick Meek [D-FL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Rep. John Salazar [D-CO] | Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-04 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-11-04 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 1, 2 Present (Roll no. 843). (text: CR 11/3/2009 H12256) | |
2009-11-04 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12301) | |
2009-11-03 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-11-03 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 858. | |
2009-11-03 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12256-12257) | |
2009-11-03 | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-10-22 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Economic development
Foreign aid and international relief
Inter-American Foundation
Latin America