US HR846 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives on support for Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives on support for Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
2018-04-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2018-04-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback