US HR829 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2892) making appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2010.
Title
Providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 2892) making appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2010, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-15 | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 239 - 174 (Roll no. 781). (text: CR H11389) | |
2009-10-15 | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 173 (Roll no. 780). (consideration: CR H11392-11393) | |
2009-10-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 829. | |
2009-10-15 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H11389-11394) | |
2009-10-14 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 120. | |
2009-10-14 | All points of order against the conference report and against its consideration are waived. The conference report shall be considered as read. | |
2009-10-14 | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-300, by Mr. Hastings (FL). |
Same As/Similar To
HB2892 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Became Public Law No: 111-83.