US HR813 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-4)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals of World AIDS Day.
Title
Supporting the goals of World AIDS Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-11-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR461 (Related) 2021-11-30 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S8832-8833)
HR1504 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR856 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6943-6944)
HR1504 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR856 (Related) 2022-12-01 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S6943-6944)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/813/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres813/BILLS-117hres813ih.pdf |