US HR809 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the importance of the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea and the contributions of Korean Americans in the United States. This resolution recognizes the importance of the U.S.-Korea alliance in promoting peace and security in the Indo-Pacific region and calls for further strengthening ties between the countries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing the importance of the United States alliance with the Republic of Korea and the contributions of Korean Americans in the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2020-01-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR301 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR152 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S80; text: CR S80)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback