US HR807 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution honors Dr. Aristides de Sousa Mendes do Amaral e Abranches, who as consul of Portugal in Bordeaux, France, saved thousands of lives by issuing transit visas to French Jews and other persons, sparing them from Nazi occupation and the Holocaust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring the humanitarian work of Dr. Aristides de Sousa Mendes do Amaral e Abranches to save the lives of French Jews and other persons during the Holocaust.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
2021-11-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-11-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR89 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1032)
SR186 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2303; text: CR S2298-2299)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback