US HR803 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-34)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Pending: House Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
Pending: House Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for Australia, as well as greater collaboration between the United States and Australia to promote wildfire mitigation and prevention.
Title
Recognizing the longstanding partnership between the United States and Australia to share critical firefighting resources during times of crisis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H203-204) |
Same As/Similar To
SR527 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S1478-1479)
Subjects
Australia
Congressional tributes
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Oceania
Congressional tributes
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Forests, forestry, trees
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Oceania
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/803/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres803/BILLS-116hres803ih.pdf |