US HR803 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the weeks of March 25, 2018, through April 7, 2018, as National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks. Expresses support for the designation of National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks. (Young Audiences Arts for Learning is a nonprofit organization that presents arts-in-education programs to students and teachers.) Honors the contributions that Young Audiences Arts for Learning programs have made in enriching the lives of students, teachers, volunteers, families, and communities.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the weeks of March 25, 2018, through April 7, 2018, as National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR251 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/803/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres803/BILLS-115hres803ih.pdf |