US HR796 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4768) to amend title 5, United States Code, with respect to the judicial review of agency interpretations of statutory and regulatory provisions; providing for proceedings during the period from June 23, 2016, through July 4, 2016; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4768) to amend title 5, United States Code, with respect to the judicial review of agency interpretations of statutory and regulatory provisions; providing for proceedings during the period from June 23, 2016, through July 4, 2016; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4768) to amend title 5, United States Code, with respect to the judicial review of agency interpretations of statutory and regulatory provisions; providing for proceedings during the period from June 23, 2016, through July 4, 2016; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 232 N: 168 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 230 N: 168 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 230 N: 168 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 230 N: 168 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 230 N: 168 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-05 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 230 - 168 (Roll no. 344). (text: CR H4208) |
2016-07-05 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 168 (Roll no. 343). (consideration: CR H4215, H4240) |
2016-07-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4240-4241) |
2016-07-05 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 796, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until a time to be announced. |
2016-07-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 796. |
2016-07-05 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4208-4215) |
2016-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 129. |
2016-06-23 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4768 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. |
2016-06-23 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-641, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4768 (Related) 2016-07-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.