US HR790 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1230) to amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 and other laws to clarify appropriate standards for Federal employment discrimination and retaliation claims, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 76) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Borrower Defense Institutional Accountability"; and providing for proceedings during the period from January 17, 2020, through January 24, 2020. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1230) to amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 and other laws to clarify appropriate standards for Federal employment discrimination and retaliation claims, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 76) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Borrower Defense Institutional Accountability"; and providing for proceedings during the period from January 17, 2020, through January 24, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1230) to amend the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 and other laws to clarify appropriate standards for Federal employment discrimination and retaliation claims, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 76) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Department of Education relating to "Borrower Defense Institutional Accountability"; and providing for proceedings during the period from January 17, 2020, through January 24, 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 17 (Y: 216 N: 200 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 16 (Y: 226 N: 191 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-01-14HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 200 (Roll no. 17). (text: CR H216)
2020-01-14HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 226 - 191 (Roll no. 16). (consideration: CR H222)
2020-01-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 790.
2020-01-14HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H216-223)
2020-01-13HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 69.
2020-01-13HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1230 and H.J. Res. 76 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
2020-01-13HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-377, by Mr. DeSaulnier.

Same As/Similar To

HB1230 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR790 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR76 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Received in the Senate.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback