US HR772 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Original LGBTQ Pride Month Resolution of 2016 Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer (LGBTQ) rights are human rights to be recognized and protected by the U.S. Constitution; and (2) the United States should continue to strive to ensure that the promise of equality is realized for all people in the United States. Recognizes that all people in the United States should be treated fairly and equally regardless of sexual orientation or gender identity. Acknowledges the struggle of the Stonewall protestors (human rights protesters at the Stonewall Inn in New York City on June 28, 1969) and countless other LGBTQ people for equality, Encourages the celebration of LGBTQ Pride Month.
Title
Original LGBTQ Pride Month Resolution of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2016-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR329 (Related) 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Human rights
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Commemorative events and holidays
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Human rights
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/772/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres772/BILLS-114hres772ih.pdf |