US HR759 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the support of the House of Representatives for the designation of "Public Radio Music Day" and its deep appreciation for the role of public radio music stations in serving listeners, musicians, and hundreds of communities in the United States.
Title
Expressing the support of the House of Representatives for the designation of "Public Radio Music Day" and its deep appreciation for the role of public radio music stations in serving listeners, musicians, and hundreds of communities in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR444 (Same As) 2021-11-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8055; text: CR S7799)
HR1306 (Related) 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR813 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5556-5557)
HR1306 (Related) 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR813 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5556-5557)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/759/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres759/BILLS-117hres759ih.pdf |