US HR753 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging people in the United States to recognize March 2, 2018, as Read Across America Day. Honors all authors for their successes in encouraging children to discover the joy of reading. Honors the 21st anniversary of Read Across America Day. Encourages parents, educators, and communities to read with their children for at least 30 minutes on Read Across America Day.
Title
Encouraging people in the United States to recognize March 2, 2018, as Read Across America Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR168 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR422 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
SR79 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1583, S1585; text as passed Senate: CR S1583)
SR422 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1319)
SR79 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1583, S1585; text as passed Senate: CR S1583)
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/753/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres753/BILLS-115hres753ih.pdf |