US HR745 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of October 24, 2021, to October 31, 2021, as "BatWeek".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of October 24, 2021, to October 31, 2021, as "BatWeek".
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1446 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SR830 (Related) 2022-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SR830 (Related) 2022-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/745/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres745/BILLS-117hres745ih.pdf |