US HR744 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-33)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. (consideration: CR H8696-8700; text: CR H8698-8699)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. (consideration: CR H8696-8700; text: CR H8698-8699)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and the International Covenant on Civil and Political Rights.
Title
Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and the International Covenant on Civil and Political Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-01 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. (consideration: CR H8696-8700; text: CR H8698-8699) |
2022-12-01 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1499, proceedings on H. Res. 744 are considered vacated. |
2022-11-29 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Ms. Schakowsky asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H. Res. 744, a bill originally introduced by Representative Deutch, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 744. |
2022-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8631-8633; text: CR H8631-8632) |
2022-11-29 | House | Ms. Jacobs (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-27 | House | Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and Global Counterterrorism Discharged. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and Global Counterterrorism. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR183 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2297)
HR1499 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1499 (Related) 2022-11-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.