US HR740 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E218)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E218)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of March 3, 2018, as World Hearing Day. Expresses support for the designation of World Hearing Day. Recognizes the importance of preventing hearing loss through self-protective behavior and the importance of patient access to early detection and intervention by health care professionals in the process of identification, treatment, and rehabilitation of hearing loss.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of March 3, 2018, as World Hearing Day.
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E218) |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hearing, speech, and vision care
World health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hearing, speech, and vision care
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/740/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres740/BILLS-115hres740ih.pdf |