US HR713 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 1309 (Workplace Violence Prevention for Health Care and Social Service Workers Act). Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from November 22, 2019, through December 2, 2019. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of November 21, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1309) to direct the Secretary of Labor to issue an occupational safety and health standard that requires covered employers within the health care and social service industries to develop and implement a comprehensive workplace violence prevention plan, and for other purposes; providing for proceedings during the period from November 22, 2019, through December 2, 2019; and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-20 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 633 (Y: 209 N: 205 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 632 (Y: 223 N: 194 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 632 (Y: 223 N: 194 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-20 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 205 (Roll no. 633). (text: CR H9068-9069) |
2019-11-20 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 194 (Roll no. 632). (consideration: CR H9072, H9098) |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9098-9099) |
2019-11-20 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the resolution, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and announced, by voice vote, that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Burgess demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2019-11-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 713. |
2019-11-20 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H9068-9072) |
2019-11-19 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 55. |
2019-11-19 | House | Also provides for proceedings during the period from November 22, 2019 through December 2, 2019 and for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. |
2019-11-19 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-302, by Mr. DeSaulnier. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1309 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR713 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR713 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.