US HR695 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 4863 (United States Export Finance Agency Act of 2019). Additionally, the resolution adopts H.Res. 661 (authorizing the Office of General Counsel of the House to retain private counsel, either for pay or pro bono, in support of the ongoing inquiry into whether sufficient grounds exist for the House to impeach President Trump) and H.Res. 693 (authorizing the Director of the Office of Diversity and Inclusion and the Director of the Office of the Whistleblower Ombudsman to each appoint and fix the pay of their office's employees). H.Res. 6 (adopting the Rules of the House of Representatives for the 116th Congress) is amended to (1) require the Select Committee on the Modernization of Congress to submit its final report to the House by October 30, 2020, and (2) terminate the committee at the conclusion of the 116th Congress. At any time on the legislative day of Thursday, November 21, 2019, it shall be in order to consider in the House a motion to discharge the Committee on Foreign Affairs from consideration of H.Con.Res. 70 (directing the President to remove unauthorized U.S. Armed Forces from hostilities in Syria).
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4863) to promote the competitiveness of the United States, to reform and reauthorize the United States Export Finance Agency, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 616 (Y: 228 N: 198 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 615 (Y: 226 N: 198 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 615 (Y: 226 N: 198 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-14 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 198 (Roll no. 616). (text: CR H8838) |
2019-11-14 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 226 - 198 (Roll no. 615). (consideration: CR H8843-8844) |
2019-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 695. |
2019-11-14 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8838-8845) |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 53. |
2019-11-13 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4863 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Specified amendments are in order. |
2019-11-13 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-289, by Mr. DeSaulnier. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4863 (Related) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR695 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR661 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 695, H. Res. 661 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8845; text: CR H8845)
HR693 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 695, H. Res. 693 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8845; text: CR H8845)
HR695 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR661 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 695, H. Res. 661 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8845; text: CR H8845)
HR693 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 695, H. Res. 693 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8845; text: CR H8845)