US HR693 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1529, H. Res. 693 is considered passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1529, H. Res. 693 is considered passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the 25th anniversary of Radio Free Asia and its mission to provide an independent source of news to closed societies in Asia.
Title
Recognizing the 25th anniversary of Radio Free Asia and its mission to provide an independent source of news to closed societies in Asia.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1529, H. Res. 693 is considered passed House. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation. |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR394 (Same As) 2022-07-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3687-3688; text: CR S3687-3688)
HR1529 (Related) 2022-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1529 (Related) 2022-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.