US HR674 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 22, 2021, as "National Hispanic Nurses Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 22, 2021, as "National Hispanic Nurses Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/674/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres674/BILLS-117hres674ih.pdf |