US HR674 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing linemen, the profession of linemen, the contributions of these brave men and women who protect public safety, and expressing support for the designation of April 18, 2016, as National Lineman Appreciation Day. Recognizes the efforts of linemen in keeping the electrical power on and protecting public safety. Expresses support for the designation of National Lineman Appreciation Day.
Title
Recognizing linemen, the profession of linemen, the contributions of these brave men and women who protect public safety, and expressing support for the designation of April 18, 2016, as National Lineman Appreciation Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR433 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2350)
HR685 (Same As) 2016-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HR685 (Same As) 2016-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Labor and employment
Worker safety and health
Congressional tributes
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Labor and employment
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/674/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres674/BILLS-114hres674ih.pdf |