US HR667 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3755) to protect a person's ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider's ability to provide abortion services; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4350) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2022 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5305) making continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for providing emergency assistance, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3755) to protect a person's ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider's ability to provide abortion services; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4350) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2022 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5305) making continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for providing emergency assistance, and for other purposes; and for other purposes. Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3755) to protect a person’s ability to determine whether to continue or end a pregnancy, and to protect a health care provider’s ability to provide abortion services; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4350) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2022 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5305) making continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for providing emergency assistance, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-21 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 218 N: 210 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 217 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-09-21HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 207 (Roll no. 264). (text: CR H4564-4565)
2021-09-21HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 218 - 210 (Roll no. 263).
2021-09-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 667.
2021-09-21HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4564-4576)
2021-09-21HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 34.
2021-09-21HouseRule provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3755; one hour of debate on H.R. 4350, with consideration under a structured rule; and one hour of debate on H.R. 5305, with consideration under a closed rule. The rule provides that proceedings may be postponed through October 1, 2021, on measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of July 26, July 27, or September 21, 2021 and on which the yeas and nays were ordered. The rule provides that House Resolution 188, agreed to March 8, 2021, is further amended by striking "September 22, 2021" and inserting "October 27, 2021".
2021-09-21HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-125, by Ms. Ross.

Same As/Similar To

HB3755 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 48. Record Vote Number: 65. (CR S826)
HR667 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
HB5305 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-43. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback