US HR641 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing and celebrating the 75th anniversary of the National Association of Conservation Districts and their commitment to our lands.
Title
Recognizing and celebrating the 75th anniversary of the National Association of Conservation Districts and their commitment to our lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 171. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-676. |
2022-02-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |