US HR6 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopting the Rules of the House of Representatives for the One Hundred Sixteenth Congress, and for other purposes. This resolution adopts the Rules of the House of Representatives for the 116th Congress. The resolution adopts the rules of the 115th Congress with amendments that include allowing Delegates and the Resident Commissioner to vote in the Committee of the Whole; revising annual ethics training requirements; providing mandatory anti-harassment and anti-discrimination policies for House offices; prohibiting Members, officers, and employees of the House from serving as an officer or director of a public company; requiring Members to pay for any discrimination settlements against them; requiring indicted Members to step down from any committee and leadership positions until disposition of the criminal case; reinstating certain provisions of Pay-As-You-Go rules; providing for automatic suspension of the debt limit if the House adopts a budget resolution (Gephardt rule); requiring committee hearings and markups on bills and joint resolutions before floor consideration; revising the rule prohibiting a floor vote on a measure before the third day text is available to require text to be available for 72 hours before a floor vote; excluding measures addressing the War Powers Resolution from "motions to table"; renaming, establishing, or reauthorizing specified congressional committees, commissions, and offices; creating a Consensus Calendar, which provides an alternative path to a floor vote for measures with 290 or more cosponsors; permitting religious headwear in the Hall of the House; and authorizing the Speaker to intervene in litigation involving the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. The resolution also bans (1) discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity, and (2) sexual relationships between Members and committee staff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting the Rules of the House of Representatives for the One Hundred Sixteenth Congress, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-09 - House - On agreeing to Title III of the resolution RC# 19 (Y: 235 N: 192 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-04 - House - On agreeing to Title II of the resolution RC# 12 (Y: 418 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-03 - House - On agreeing to Title I of the resolution RC# 7 (Y: 234 N: 197 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-09HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-09HouseOn agreeing to Title III of the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 192 (Roll no. 19).
2019-01-09HouseThe previous question on the motion On agreeing to Title III of the resolution was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-01-09HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 5, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on Title III of H. Res. 6.
2019-01-09HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H338-346)
2019-01-04HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to section 3 of H. Res. 5, the Chair announced that further proceedings on H. Res. 6 would be postponed.
2019-01-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-04HouseOn agreeing to Title II of the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 418 - 12 (Roll no. 12).
2019-01-04HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H224-225)
2019-01-04HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on Title II of H. Res. 6, the Chair put the question on agreeing to Title II of the resolution and by voice vote announced that ayes had prevailed. Mr. Cole demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further consideration on the question until a time to be announced.
2019-01-04HouseThe previous question was ordered on Title II pursuant to the rule.
2019-01-04HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 5, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on Title II of H. Res. 6.
2019-01-04HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H220-224)
2019-01-03HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to section 3 of H.Res. 5, the Chair announced that further proceedings on H.Res. 6 would be postponed.
2019-01-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-03HouseOn agreeing to Title I of the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 197 (Roll no. 7).
2019-01-03HouseThe previous question was ordered on Title I pursuant to the rule.
2019-01-03HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 5, the House proceeded with 30 minutes of debate on Title I of H.Res. 6.
2019-01-03HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 5. (consideration: CR H17-32)
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR5 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR18 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR14 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR16 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S146; text: CR S145-146)

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congress
Congressional committees
Congressional leadership
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Agriculture
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Food assistance and relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
House Committee on Agriculture
House Committee on Education and Labor
House Committee on Ethics
House Committee on Financial Services
House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
House Committee on Rules
House of Representatives
House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Human rights
Judicial review and appeals
Lawyers and legal services
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Public participation and lobbying
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sports and recreation facilities
Student aid and college costs
War and emergency powers

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback